THE EGYPTIAN CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX ASSOCIATION FOR THE MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity continues to provide activities in pursuit of its main objects and with the generosity of its members continues to prosper.The charity continues to meet its objectives through Christian teaching,church services, sunday schools, retreat homes and activities for children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Solihull
Governance
- 24 October 1984: Standard registration
- COPTIC CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Atef Michael | Trustee | 30 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ramez Gabriel | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yosry Gabriel | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amir Salama | Trustee | 31 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAMDOUH SADEK YOUSSEF | Trustee | 05 October 2002 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOKHLIS MINA | Trustee | 21 December 1985 |
|
|
||||
Dr FAYEK N YOUSSEF | Trustee | 10 July 1985 |
|
|
||||
Dr KAMAL MOUSA | Trustee | 10 July 1985 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £845.78k | £632.29k | £616.86k | £424.88k | £350.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £600.61k | £58.14k | £440.89k | £421.01k | £479.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £845.78k | £529.57k | £542.46k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £102.40k | £74.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £667 | £321 | £58 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £570.56k | £58.14k | £411.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £7.52k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £36.28k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £30.05k | £0 | £29.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 APRIL 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EGYPTIAN CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH IN THE METROPOLITAN COUNTY OF WEST MIDLANDS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE DECALRATION OF TRUST).
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blythe Gate
Blythe Valley Park
Solihull
Solihull
West Midlands
B90 8AH
- Phone:
- 01216935000
- Email:
- georgetamalek@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window