Accounts and annual returns I.M.M.E

Charity number: 1190684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 26 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 09 December 2024 284 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 09 December 2024 284 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 29 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 29 March 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window