Accounts and annual returns ISASI FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1189229
Charity reporting is up to date (121 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 February 2024 07 April 2025 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2024 07 April 2025 121 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 February 2023 27 April 2024 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2023 27 April 2024 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 February 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2022 26 March 2023 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 February 2021 05 January 2022 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 February 2021 05 January 2022 29 days late Download Open in new window