PK PORTHCURNO

Charity number: 1189090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PK Porthcurno preserves the important historic buildings and collections relating to the telegraph station at Porthcurno. It educates the general public about the history of the telegraph station and provides internationally significant archive and research resources for study of the history of international telecommunications.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 2020: CIO registration
  • 08 December 2021: Funds received from 1062233 THE PORTHCURNO COLLECTIONS TRUST
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE PK TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Stephen Fyles Chair 16 April 2020
HAY CASTLE TRUST
Received: On time
Rabindra Mathivanan Paramothayan Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
JULIE SEYLER Trustee 24 April 2024
THE ROYAL INSTITUTION OF CORNWALL
Received: On time
Gordon Robert Johnston Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
Dr Shini Somarathne Trustee 11 May 2023
CAMPAIGN FOR SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING
Received: On time
Dr Cassandra Rose Newland Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
DAVID GEORGE FOOT Trustee 28 April 2021
ROTARY CLUB OF HIGHCLIFFE-ON-SEA TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Professor Polina Bayvel Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Andrew James MacLeod Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Deborah Tritton Trustee 01 October 2020
DEVON AND CORNWALL RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
Richard Charles Perry Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £375.52k £1.47m £649.10k £731.01k
Total expenditure £378.04k £920.21k £885.97k £998.94k
Income from government contracts £1.16k £5.22k £1.28k N/A
Income from government grants £50.84k £43.96k £11.00k £10.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £907.23k £24.41k £21.89k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £213.82k £370.14k £473.70k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £337.13k £216.63k £202.31k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £24.41k £0
Income - Investment N/A £11.88k £37.93k £33.12k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £850.36k £761.36k £824.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £69.84k £124.61k £174.88k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £9.55k £8.09k £8.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £1.85k £2.46k £3.36k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A £4.78m £4.46m £4.39m
Long-term investments N/A £0 £235.00k £235.00k
Other assets N/A £613.43k £489.68k £370.97k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £42.86k £84.36k £125.87k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PK Porthcurno
Eastern House
Porthcurno
PENZANCE
TR19 6JX
Phone:
01736810966