ETERNAL COVENANT MINISTRIES OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of special events and meetings to meet the specific needs of target groups in the church such as men, women, youth and children. Focusing on the material needs of certain members undergoing difficult financial situations. Working with other Christian agencies London to advance the preaching of the gospel. Distribution of food, toiletries and other household essentials to families in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 February 2020: CIO registration
- ETERNAL COVENANT MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cynthia Salami | Chair | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esther Obaleye | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Akinde | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Olukayode Aina | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ebun Briggs | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/02/2021 | 07/02/2022 | 07/02/2023 | 07/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £3.70k | £3.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £3.50k | £3.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 February 2023 | 07 April 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2023 | 07 April 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 February 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 February 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2021 | 01 February 2023 | 421 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Perryman House
100 The Shaftesburys
BARKING
IG11 7LA
- Phone:
- 07761874749
- Website:
-
wwweternalcovenantoutreach.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window