FRIENDS OF TREORCHY PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our group was formed in 2016 with the aim of improving Treorchy Park and its surrounding area. We host many events at the park for the public and have been instrumental in securing new playground equipment and improvements to the park infrastructure. We also operate the paddling pool each year during the summer holidays which is a much needed community resource which is free of charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £13,850 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 19 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gaynor Denise Webster | Chair | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Bates | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Farr | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jones | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Owain White | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Joan Ridgers | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Ann Ball | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee Raymond Edgar Cole | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shay Fisher | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emyr John Webster | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88 | £24.88k | £39.74k | £33.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207 | £25.14k | £39.48k | £26.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £7.66k | £13.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 March 2025 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 March 2025 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 November 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TREORCI, WALES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE TREORCHY PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
129 High Street
TREORCHY
CF42 6PA
- Phone:
- 07805908156
- Email:
- treorchypark@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window