Financial history LINCOLNSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 515652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.70m £1.81m £2.61m £3.83m £2.94m
Total expenditure £1.60m £1.12m £2.35m £2.92m £3.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £135.35k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £613.94k £543.15k £132.81k £128.21k £164.19k
Income - Other trading activities £704.96k £263.55k £980.69k £1.14m £1.28m
Income - Charitable activities £104.25k £86.67k £988.19k £1.09m £1.29m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £130.05k £623.25k £500.97k £157.42k £190.86k
Income - Other £144.38k £295.72k £10.81k £1.32m £18.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £10.09k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £956.33k £1.74m £2.10m £2.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £543.44k £166.87k £602.68k £817.70k £902.59k
Expenditure - Governance £11.50k £11.50k £12.00k £12.75k £21.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £700
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0