WOODGREEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for activities of villagers, local societies and groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 04 June 2020: CIO registration
- 14 April 2023: Funds received from 203980 WOODGREEN VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Jean Calder | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Mhairi Cameron Benest | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Ann Carroll | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Maria Anton | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Harris | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Lucy Vickers | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Christine Harper | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Roger Flack | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Hayward | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Christine Hall | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.98k | £31.09k | £34.59k | £29.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.08k | £15.02k | £14.99k | £36.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.64k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WOODGREEN AND ITS LOCAL AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND ' (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE -INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODGREEN VILLAGE HALL
HALE ROAD
WOODGREEN
FORDINGBRIDGE
SP6 2AJ
- Phone:
- 01725511639
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window