Trustees SOCIETY FOR INTERNATIONAL FOLK DANCING

Charity number: 1189141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Mellish Chair 06 December 1998
None on record
Brenda Steventon Trustee 08 September 2018
None on record
Holly Payling Trustee 22 September 2012
None on record
John Stewart Trustee 22 September 2012
None on record
DALILA HAIGOUHI HEATH Trustee 04 September 2011
AKHTAMAR ARMENIAN PERFORMANCE GROUP
Received: 12 days late
Caspar Cronk Trustee 01 December 1994
None on record
Judith Payling Trustee 02 December 1979
None on record