GOTHIC OPERA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the art of opera by the provision of artistic projects including performances of rare works related to supernatural and/or gothic subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edoardo Cesarino | Chair | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr LINDA HIRST | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr David Michael Usher | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louis Antoine de Girard de Charbonnieres | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/08/2021 | 02/08/2022 | 02/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.57k | £96.71k | £58.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.96k | £67.03k | £82.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2020 as amended on 20 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF OPERA BY THE PROVISION OF ARTISTIC PROJECTS INCLUDING PERFORMANCES OF RARE WORKS RELATED TO SUPERNATURAL AND/OR GOTHIC SUBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit F2
Beehive Yard
Bath
BA1 5BT
BA1 5BT
- Phone:
- 07387748204
- Email:
- info@gothicopera.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window