PVOD UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG SUFFERERS OF PULMONARY VENO-OCCLUSIVE DISEASE (PVOD) BY A) RAISING AWARENESS OF AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ON THE SYMPTOMS, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PVOD; B) FUNDING RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF PVOD AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felix Medlock | Chair | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Caven | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Holly Elgood-Curtis | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Abraham | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £150 | |
|
Total expenditure | £262 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 March 2023 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 March 2023 | 486 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG SUFFERERS OF PULMONARY VENO-OCCLUSIVE DISEASE (PVOD) BY A) RAISING AWARENESS OF AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ON THE SYMPTOMS, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PVOD; B) FUNDING RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF PVOD AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Dean Ryle Street
London
SW1P 4DA
- Phone:
- 07891648571
- Email:
- pvoduk@yahoo.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window