CYLCH MEITHRIN SARNAU/LLANDDERFEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cylch Meithrin Sarnau a Llanddrfel is a preschool nursery for children between the ages of 2.5 years up to 4 years of age before they start school full time. The Cylch is open every day during educational timescale and offers after school clubs and holiday clubs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £375 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 27 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elin Llwyd Rowlands | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Llinos Rowlands | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Buddug Eidda Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.20k | £89.80k | £75.52k | £42.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.11k | £56.13k | £62.63k | £61.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £13.39k | £375 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN SARNAU AND LLANDDERFEL THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE. THIS IS DONE BY: A) PROVIDING AND PRESENTING SAFE AND SATISFIED PLAY AND ACTIVITIES B) ARRANGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES ORDER TO HELP PARENTS SUPPORT THEIR CHILDREN, AND C) PROMOTING THE AIMS OF MUDIAD YSGOLION MOTHERING AND PRESENTING THEM TO PARENTS/GUARDIANS; ENCOURAGING THEM TO SEND THEIR CHILDREN ON TO WELSH MEDIUM EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Neuadd y Sarnau
Cefnddwysarn
Y Bala
LL23 7LG
- Phone:
- 07557791120
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window