GULZARE HABIB BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Islamic Centre of Worship Provide Islamic Education Provide facilities in the interest of Social Welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 23 April 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Shaban | Chair | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nazacat Hussain | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Arshad Mahmood | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sajid Hussain | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.17k | £536.98k | £486.18k | £287.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £282.69k | £529.74k | £493.25k | £218.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £268.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £61.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £207.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £193.74k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £336.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 TO PROVIDE AN ISLAMIC CENTRE OF WORSHIP. 4.2 TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY OF BIRMINGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 College Road
Moseley
BIRMINGHAM
B13 9LS
- Phone:
- 0121 296 9566
- Email:
- info@sbcmasjid.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window