CURE CLCN4 LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a registered charity aimed at providing support, raising awareness and funding medical research for effective treatments for CLCN4. CLCN4 is a rare genetic condition that causes intellectual disability and other problems such as epilepsy, behavioural disorders, movement disorders and microcephaly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 July 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter James Alistair Trill | Chair | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul McGuinness | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Karim | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Wise | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Larry Louison | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wang Sin Tan | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £107.72k | £23.49k | £78.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.55k | £33.10k | £45.35k | £118.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SAVING OF LIVES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH: (I) PROVIDING RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM PATHOGENIC VARIANTS OF CLCN4; AND (II) THE FUNDING OF MEDICAL RESEARCH ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD FOR THE PURPOSE OF DISCOVERING, DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING TREATMENT FOR PATIENTS WITH PATHOGENIC VARIANTS OF CLCN4; AND (B) THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN EACH CASE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Duke Street
London
W1U 3EH
- Phone:
- +442079350992
- Email:
- peter.t@cureclcn4.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window