JAC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make grants to non-profit organisations in order to improve the lives of people suffering disadvantage and discrimination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Cameroon
- Ethiopia
- Guatemala
- India
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Rwanda
- Somalia
- South Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 18 May 2020: CIO registration
- 24 May 2022: Funds received from 1010520 J A CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST
- J A CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM HENRY BRIGHT PYM | Chair | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Linehan | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pym | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dulma CLARK | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aidan John Raymond Pelly | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Odette Clark Campbell | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.87k | £159.77k | £167.96k | £204.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £453.11k | £574.23k | £546.43k | £882.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD INCLUDING BY THE AWARD OF GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS AND IN SUCH OTHER MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Box 2
c/o C&J Clark International Ltd
40 High Street
Street
Somerset
BA16 0EQ
- Phone:
- 07802 724462
- Email:
- lynette@jaclarktrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window