KINGSBRIDGE AREA FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of food poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,000 from 5 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 15 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackie Visser | Chair | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lowe | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Michelle Morton | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Gordon Taylor | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Bruce Lennox | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Wibberley | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paula Sina Foale | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gerrie Messer | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Scott | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.36k | £187.12k | £331.69k | £258.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.13k | £234.15k | £258.47k | £285.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £44.75k | £38.50k | £63.50k | £28.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
20 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE KINGSBRIDGE AREA FOODBANK IS THE PREVENTION AND/OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN KINGSBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, HYGIENE AND HOUSEHOLD PRODUCTS, BUT ALSO RELATED ADDITIONAL SERVICES, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT FOR THOSE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingsbridge Area FoodBank
The Avon Centre
Wallingford Road
Kingsbridge
TQ7 1ND
- Phone:
- 07759 683567
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window