Accounts and annual returns THE STIRLING TRUST

Charity number: 1189164
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 11 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 04 August 2024 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 04 August 2024 181 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 10 May 2023 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 10 May 2023 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 June 2022 119 days late Download Open in new window