THE STIRLING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide a safe environment where veterans/civilian can help care for old cavalry horses. By providing a safe environment, where they can help love and care for each other. Perhaps even help their old colleagues, maybe a couple of hours a week or more. That contact between horse and rider helps to rebuild confidence that helps to quiet the mind - to give a little bit of peace.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Olsen | Chair | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emily Anna Mary Olsen | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Henrik Hilding Olsen | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ann Olsen | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.20k | £1.73k | £12.03k | £9.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71k | £2.20k | £11.61k | £9.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 May 2025 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 August 2024 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 August 2024 | 181 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 June 2022 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 The Business Hub
Admirals Yard
Keel Drive
SLOUGH
SL1 2YA
- Phone:
- 01753303403
- Email:
- info@thestirlingtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window