Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER (LEEDS)

Charity Number: 515679
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 06 May 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 25 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 25 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 08 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 08 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 24 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 24 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 19 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 19 January 2007 On Time