PUSEY HOUSE CIO

Charity number: 1190385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The CIO exists to perpetuate the memory of Dr Pusey by; * the maintenance of the institution known as Pusey House as a house of sacred learning; *the affording of religious help and counsel to members of the University of Oxford; and *the promotion of theological study and holiness of life. This is principally achieved by means of the stipends allocated to the members of the Chapter.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £377,108
Total expenditure: £546,768

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sally Firth Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
The Venerable Luke MILLER Trustee 21 October 2023
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
Sarah Collister Trustee 21 October 2023
None on record
The Revd Canon David Stanton Trustee 21 October 2023
None on record
Dr John Cooper Trustee 25 June 2022
None on record
Matthew Chinery Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
Andrew Woodcock Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
Rev Paul Richard Thomas Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
THE REVD JONATHAN WARWICK BESWICK SSC Trustee 07 April 2021
THE SOCIETY OF MARY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S DOCKS WITH ST JOHN OF WAPPING IN THE DIOCESE OF LONDON
Recently registered
Dr Nigel Roy Aston Trustee 07 April 2021
None on record
The Rt Revd Dr Michael Langrish Trustee 07 April 2021
None on record
Emma Joy Gregory Trustee 07 April 2021
None on record
Marina Margaret Tinsdale Jones Trustee 07 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £541.48k £472.28k £377.11k
Total expenditure £409.55k £533.98k £546.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £430.37k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £60.50k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £50.62k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £99.50k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £409.55k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £26.20k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 19 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS EDUCATION THROUGH: (A) ASSISTING IN THE MAINTENANCE OF PUSEY HOUSE AS A PLACE OF SACRED LEARNING; (B) ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS HELP AND COUNSEL TO MEMBERS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD; (C) THE PRESERVATION AND ACQUISITION OF BOOKS OR OTHER LEARNING RESOURCES AND OF THE LIBRARY, CHAPEL AND BUILDINGS OF PUSEY HOUSE; (D) PROMOTING THEOLOGICAL STUDY AND HOLINESS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
OXFORD
Registration history
  • 08 May 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
PUSEY HOUSE
ST. GILES
OXFORD
OX1 3LZ
Phone:
01865288023