BETHANIA CHURCH MAESTEG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities - Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 03 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cory Stuart Price BA,MTh | Chair | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR EIRUG MORGAN LLOYD | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83k | £25.03k | £33.22k | £41.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.62k | £10.61k | £39.88k | £44.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 307 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
04 December 2024 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 April 2022
(These accounts |
26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THIS CHURCH SHALL BE TO GLORIFY GOD. IT SHALL SEEK TO ATTAIN THIS END THROUGH THE PUBLIC WORSHIP OF GOD, THE PREACHING OF THE SCRIPTURES, CONSISTENT CHRISTIAN LIVING BY ITS MEMBERS, PERSONAL EVANGELISM, MISSIONARY ENDEAVOR AND CHRISTIAN EDUCATION (EPH. 1:5-14; COL. 1:9-10; MAT. 5:16; 1 PET. 2:9-12).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bethel Central Church
Church Street
Maesteg
CF34 9AA
- Phone:
- 07779927506
- Email:
- lloyd.eirug@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window