HAVANT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Visiting Speakers address our membership on various educational topics to inform, entertain and stimulate a spirit of enquiry. Havant U3A has over 30 self-help learning groups covering a wide range of subjects offering members the chance to share the knowledge acquired during their lives or try something completely new.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 February 2020: CIO registration
- 22 February 2022: Funds received from 1151725 HAVANT U3A
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Ayoub Jorge | Chair | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jean Munday | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Hudson | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Lucille McQueen-Pillans | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Newman | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY WORTHINGTON | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Walter West | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET STANGER BSC | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Clifford Owen | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary White | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.01k | £12.72k | £22.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.27k | £13.65k | £22.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Feb 2020 as amended on 21 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Talbot Close
HAVANT
Hampshire
PO9 3HS
- Phone:
- 02392619152
- Email:
- treasurer@havantu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window