Accounts and annual returns WORLD LIGHT INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES (UK)

Charity Number: 1189850
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 March 2025 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 March 2025 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 August 2024 555 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 August 2024 555 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 April 2022 88 days late Download Open in new window