CATHAYS BRASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an inclusive ensemble who work to develop the skills of any Brass musician in Cathays. We can often be seen keeping community music alive through creating social rehearsal and performance opportunities across Cardiff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 09 November 2020: Standard registration
- BAND PRES Y WAUN DDYFAL (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Farrington | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Morgan | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Payne | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Showell | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELEN EVERETT | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ROGERS | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
TOMOS EVANS | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.92k | £13.63k | £18.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.28k | £13.09k | £10.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED ON 30 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF TRADITIONAL AND MODERN BRASS MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Cynan Close
Beddau
Pontypridd
33
Cynan Close
CF38 2TL
- Phone:
- 07957688554
- Email:
- band@cathaysbrass.com
- Website:
-
cathaysbrass.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window