MALAYALEE PENTECOSTAL ASSOCIATION(MPA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
National Conference, Area Convention, Seminar, Leadership Training , Worship, Youth Activities, Women's fellowship, Evangelism, Out reach Campaign for the Gospel and other gatherings for the growth of Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JACOB GEORGE SALEMNIVAS | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|||||
PASTOR JAMES SAMUEL | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Varghese Thekkeparumbil koshy | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev VARGHESE Palakkal Abraham | Trustee | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.18k | £1.36k | £16.55k | £15.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £0 | £12.89k | £19.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
1. ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION (CHRISTIAN PENTECOSTAL FAITH) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH AS A CHARITABLE PURPOSE INCLUDES THE PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP, CARRYING OUT CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES, MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK, RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AND PRACTICES. Ò PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP Ò HOLDING THE APPROPRIATE SERVICES, AND CEREMONIES OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, OR PROVIDING BUILDINGS OR OTHER FACILITIES TO ALLOW SERVICES, CEREMONIES TO TAKE PLACE RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE BELIEFS OR PRACTICES OF CHRISTIANITY, FOR EXAMPLE BY PROVIDING BOOKS OR ONLINE MATERIALS Ò PROVIDING EDUCATION OR INSTRUCTION IN CHRISTIAN PENTECOSTAL FAITH. Ò UNDERTAKING OR ENCOURAGING MISSIONARY, OUTREACH OR PASTORAL WORK IN THE COMMUNITY OR IN PLACES LIKE HOSPITALS AND PRISONS Ò SEEKING NEW FOLLOWERS Ò FACILITATING OR UNDERTAKING DEVOTIONAL ACTS SUCH AS VISITING THE SICK OR DYING Ò WORKING TO ADVANCE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF CHRISTIAN FAITH IN GENERAL. 2. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION: THIS PURPOSE OF ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION DIRECTLY AIMED TOWARDS PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IT COVERS TRAINING, RESEARCH AND BROADER EDUCATION IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING. EDUCATION INCREASES LEARNING AND KNOWLEDGE AMONG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC. GENERALLY, EDUCATION INCLUDES BOTH TEACHING AND LEARNING, AND THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION IN A STRUCTURED AND NEUTRAL WAY, OR TRAINING IN A SUBJECT. 3. RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED. PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE PROVIDING SPECIALIST ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND ADVOCACY SERVICES PROVIDING RELIEF FROM LONELINESS AND ISOLATION THROUGH BEFRIENDING SCHEMES AND DROP-IN CENTRES PROVIDING TRANSPORT, EQUIPMENT OR MEDICAL SUPPLIES THAT AID MOBILITY, ALLEVIATE DISCOMFORT OR IMPROVE A PERSONÆS QUALITY OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Legion Row
Navigation Street
Trethomas
CAERPHILLY
Mid Glamorgan
CF83 8JA
- Phone:
- 07545035119
- Email:
- mpauk.org@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window