KOTOR KITTIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kotor Kitties helps the homeless cats of Montenegro live healthier lives and reduces the homeless population through spaying and neutering. Kotor Kitties also provides education regarding sterilisation as a solution to the country's stray animal population.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Montenegro
Governance
- 21 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Jane Davies | Chair | 21 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Tamsyn Ross | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Faye Morley-Vaughan | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Elisabeth Jane Davies | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Belchamber | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.36k | £23.02k | £35.03k | £25.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.66k | £22.93k | £34.98k | £25.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2023
(These accounts |
09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 May 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS HOMELESS ANIMALS IN MONTENEGRO, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CATS IN KOTOR MUNICIPALITY, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE THROUGH TARGETED STERILIZATION AND CASTRATION AND ANCILLARY MEDICAL CARE SUCH AS VACCINES AND FLEA CONTROL AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 Warwick Avenue
BEDFORD
MK40 2EG
- Phone:
- 07778955346
- Email:
- contactuk@kotorkitties.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window