SOPHIE'S FUND UTTLESFORD

Charity number: 1188069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide small grants suffering financial hardship in Uttlesford and surrounding areas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 27 January 2024

Total income: £2,533
Total expenditure: £3,665

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Essex
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNA CLAIRE LOUISE HANCOCK Chair 27 January 2016
LITTLEBURY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Kaleigh Brown Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
Tony Pooley Trustee 11 October 2021
None on record
Jane Patterson Trustee 26 July 2018
None on record
Dr Catherine Buckle Trustee 13 September 2016
None on record
Marta Weronika Mularska De Bruijn Trustee 27 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/01/2021 27/01/2022 27/01/2023 27/01/2024
Total gross income £4.46k £4.15k £5.52k £2.53k
Total expenditure £4.89k £3.12k £1.90k £3.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 January 2024 14 December 2024 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 27 January 2023 02 April 2024 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 27 January 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 27 January 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 January 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 Frogge Street
Ickleton
SAFFRON WALDEN
Essex
CB10 1SH
Phone:
07977502338