Accounts and annual returns ASSEMBLE FOR ETHAN

Charity Number: 1189498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 11 February 2024 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 11 February 2024 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 16 February 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 16 February 2022 15 days late Download Open in new window