UK VETERANS HEARING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furthering the objects of the charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 March 2020: CIO registration
- UK VETERANS HEARING HELP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Bennett | Chair | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tyler Woolman | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elin Mair Tattersall | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Mercer | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kittsen | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Birdsall | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.36k | £66.90k | £88.96k | £76.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.23k | £56.47k | £64.75k | £96.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF VETERANS OF THE ARMED FORCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE SUFFERING WITH HEARING IMPAIRMENT OR HEARING LOSS AS A RESULT OF THEIR SERVICE, PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY: A) FACILITATING AND FUNDING ACCESS TO ANY NECESSARY HEARING ASSESSMENTS, EQUIPMENT AND SUPPORT. B) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE MENTAL ISSUES RESULTING FROM HEARING IMPAIRMENT AND HEARING LOSS, AND SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6
New Buildings
Hinckley
HINCKLEY
- Phone:
- 01455248900
- Email:
- info@veteranshearing.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window