THE PRESIDENT OF THE REGIMENTAL INSTITUTE (PRI)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the efficiency of the Armed Forces of The Crown by the provision and support of Mess, social, sporting and other facilities for the efficiency and wellbeing of servicemen and servicewomen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col George Robert Cobb | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maj Edward Samuel Denton | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.29k | £23.16k | £88.15k | £154.60k | £159.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.08k | £12.95k | £84.95k | £138.96k | £173.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2022
(These accounts |
12 December 2023 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF MESS, SOCIAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OD SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Honourable Artillery Co
Finsbury Barracks
City Road
LONDON
EC1Y 2BQ
- Phone:
- 02074480709
- Email:
- HAC-RAODept-FSA@mod.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window