BLIND AND SIGHT IMPAIRED SOCIETY (BASIS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BASIS provides emotional and practical support to visually impaired people in South Essex. We do this through equipment demonstration at our Resource Centre, home visit assessments, befriending services, social activity groups and providing support at the local eye clinic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £81,720 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 17 March 2020: CIO registration
- 27 May 2021: Funds received from 1074567 BLIND AND SIGHT IMPAIRED SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Maylin | Chair | 19 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Cliff Carter | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Rogers | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Howell | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Foggo | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA LEFTWICH | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.52k | £121.76k | £127.96k | £187.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.47k | £124.71k | £135.00k | £183.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £11.11k | N/A | £81.72k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.50k | £1.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SOUTH ESSEX BY WORKING WITH BLIND/VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE OVER THE AGE OF 11 WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR DISABILITY, PREVENTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE BLIND/VISUALLY IMPAIRED COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THEIR PEERS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY BY IMPROVING CONFIDENCE AND TACKLING SOCIAL ISOLATION AND LONELINESS; B) INCREASING, OR COORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE BLIND/ VISUALLY IMPAIRED COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, ENABLING THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT THEIR SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THE BLIND/ VISUALLY IMPAIRED COMMUNITY; C) DEVELOPING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO ENABLE THE PARENTS/CARERS OF BLIND/VISUALLY IMPAIRED CHILDREN TO SUPPORT THEIR CHILDREN AND MAXIMISE THEIR POTENTIAL; D) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING BLIND/VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION WITH THE AIM OF EDUCATING THE SIGHTED COMMUNITY IN ORDER TO BREAK DOWN BARRIERS BETWEEN THE TWO COMMUNITIES. 2) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF BLIND/VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN SOUTH ESSEX, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING A BEFRIENDING SERVICE TO BLIND/VISUALLY IMPAIRED ADULTS OFFERING HOME VISITS, COMPANIONSHIP, TELEPHONE BEFRIENDING AND SIGHT GUIDING ON EVERYDAY TASKS. B) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, OUTINGS, SOCIAL TRIPS AND OPPORTUNITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF A TRANSPORT SERVICE TO AND FROM RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES. C) PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO VISUAL IMPAIRMENT AND ALL ASPECTS OF LIVING WITH SIGHT LOSS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRADBURY HOUSE
WITCHARDS
BASILDON
ESSEX
SS16 5BP
- Phone:
- 01268522817
- Email:
- admin@basissouthessex.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window