SCHOOL OF SEXUALITY EDUCATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School of Sexuality Education provides award-winning relationships and sex education programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 February 2021: Standard registration
- SEXPLAIN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martha Charlotte Chillingworth | Chair | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ann Trick | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toni Siobhan Wilks-Pinnock | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.51k | £218.67k | £327.04k | £167.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.68k | £217.59k | £351.76k | £131.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.43k | N/A | £31.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 FEB 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06 NOV 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF SEXUAL HEALTH, GENDER IDENTITY, RELATIONSHIPS AND OTHER RELATED TOPICS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, TRAINING AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS. 2) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE ABOUT CONTRACEPTION, SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED INFECTION TESTING, MENSTRUAL HEALTH AND MENTAL HEALTH’S ASSOCIATION WITH SEX AND RELATIONSHIPS. 3)THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF GENDER AND/OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Camden Collective
5-7 Buck Street
London
NW1 8NJ
- Phone:
- 08004118150
- Email:
- info@schoolofsexed.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window