THE JAMES GROVE RECREATION AND SPORTS GROUND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To oversee the use of the land granted under conveyance for the use and benefit of the inhabitants of the Urban District of Halesowen as at present constituted
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dudley
Governance
- 26 October 1984: Standard registration
- THE JAMES GROVE TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Ethan Stafford | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Leonard Coldicott | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Freeman | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLLR SIMON PHIPPS | Trustee | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDY KOSZARY | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £1.38k | £2.35k | £2.07k | £4.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | £781 | £2.16k | £2.56k | £3.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1929 AND SCHEME DATED 14TH MAY 1990
Charitable objects
TO HOLD THE SAID LAND FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE URBAN DISTRICT OF HALESOWEN AS AT PRESENT CONSTITUTED IN PERPETUITY.SEE CONVEYANCE FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF HALESOWEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 MAYFIELD ROAD
HASBURY
HALESOWEN
B63 1BG
- Phone:
- 01216020463
- Email:
- info@jamesgrovetrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
jamesgrovetrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window