OASIS COMMUNITY HUB: WARNDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE HUB PROVIDES A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES FOR ALL AGES IN THE COMMUNITY OF WARNDON, WORCESTERSHIRE. CURRENT ACTIVITY INCLUDES YOUTH WORK, ENVIRONMENTAL PROJECTS, FAMILY SUPPORT, FAMILY LEARNING, HOLIDAY ACTIVITIES, TODDLERS GROUPS AND ADULT EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 May 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Culy | Chair | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Graham Good | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Arnott | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Forrest | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.83k | £66.33k | £90.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.90k | £50.54k | £63.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAR 2020 as amended on 01 May 2024
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE OBJECTS: (1) INTRODUCTION TO OBJECTS THE COMPANY IS A CHRISTIAN CHARITY, WHICH MEANS THAT IT IS COMMITTED TO THE TRANSFORMATION OF COMMUNITIES AND TO THE INCLUSION OF EVERY PERSON IN THAT PROCESS. IN ALL THAT IT DOES, THE CHARITY SHALL: A) SERVE AND RESPECT ALL PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF THEIR AGE, DISABILITY, GENDER, ÆRACEÆ, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION OR BELIEFS, PREGNANCY OR MATERNITY STATUS, MARITAL OR CIVIL PARTNERSHIP STATUS, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITY B) ACKNOWLEDGE THE FREEDOM OF PEOPLE OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE TO BOTH HOLD AND TO EXPRESS THEIR BELIEFS AND CONVICTIONS RESPECTFULLY AND FREELY, WITHIN THE LIMITS OF THE UK LAW C) NEVER IMPOSE ITS CHRISTIAN FAITH OR BELIEF ON OTHERS. (2) THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS (ÆOBJECTSÆ) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH GENERALLY C) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Oasis Centre
1A Kennington Road
LONDON
SE1 7QP
- Phone:
- 02079214200
- Email:
- info@oasisuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window