ONE NATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Not in operation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Provides Services
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Bangladesh
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Lebanon
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Syria
- Tanzania
- Turkey
- Yemen
- Zambia
Governance
- 29 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maqsood Motala | Chair | 29 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Nadeem Seedat | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Muhammed Luqman Vania | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 13 August 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS OF PEOPLE LIVING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD OF WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER OR TROUBLE, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GRANTS, GOODS, AND OTHER SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEIR BAISC NEEDS OF EDUCATION, FOOD, CLOTHING, SHELTER, HEALTHCARE OR MEDICAL AID. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AREAS POVERTY AND HARDSHIP. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AREAS OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A OXFORD STREET
BATLEY
West Yorkshire
WF17 7PZ
- Phone:
- 03005001000
- Email:
- info@onenationuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window