Financial history THE FRIENDS OF NEWPORT AND NEVERN (CYFEILLION TREFDRAETH A NANHYFER)

Charity number: 515724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.32k £154 £145 £185 £1.39k
Total expenditure £603 £331 £581 £443 £426
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A