CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is excellent fundraising for a better world. We support fundraisers through leadership and representation; best practice and compliance; education and networking; and we champion and promote fundraising as a career choice. We are also a charity, and we support charities and public benefit organisations in connecting donors and supporters with the causes they care passionately about.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,634,260
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.63m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £7.72k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,552,801
Raising funds | £186.52k | |
Charitable activities | £4.37m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £117,022 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £186.52k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.37m | |
Retained for future use | £81.46k |
People

41 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harpreet Kaur Kondel | Chair | 12 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Monwara Shanti Ali | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damian Craig Chapman | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Daniel Miller-Hughes | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Rae Tait | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Germaine Solange Rand | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary William Kernahan | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Parkes | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Mansell | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Sofia Zeenat Sheikh | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.12m | £3.94m | £4.23m | £4.63m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59m | £4.13m | £4.47m | £4.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £113.20k | £113.20k | £117.02k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £57.82k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £127.99k | £261.32k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.94m | £3.68m | £4.23m | £4.63m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.72k | |
|
Income - Other | £134 | £237 | £51 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.41m | £3.95m | £4.28m | £4.37m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £181.82k | £186.63k | £185.75k | £186.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £39.59k | £25.53k | £29.25k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £538.48k | £428.22k | £308.57k | £191.05k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.69m | £1.57m | £1.77m | £1.91m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.10m | £1.07m | £1.46m | £1.40m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 25 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO ADVANCE OR PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM; 3.1.2 TO PROMOTE HIGHER STANDARDS OF ADMINISTRATION AND FUNDRAISING FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM; AND 3.1.3 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE MATTERS REFERRED TO IN ARTICLES 3.1.1 AND 3.1.2 THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM. 3.2 NOTHING IN THESE OBJECTS SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE INSTITUTE FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canopi
82 Tanner Street
London
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 02071500439
- Email:
- info@ciof.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window