KENT AFGHAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Due to COVID 19 we were unable to do any activities this year .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 October 2020: CIO registration
- AFGHAN MEDWAY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahmad Zaky Rawfy | Chair | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
NAWEED NOORZAD | Trustee | 12 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
AHMAD ZAKI SHAHIDI | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ahmad Tarab Ahmadi | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Fahim Ahmadi | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Uldash sadeqi | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.99k | £6.59k | £12.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.13k | £6.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT LIMITED TO PERSONS OF AFGHAN ORIGIN, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS LANGUAGE CLASSES AND A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL; (2)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (3)TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER AND CLOTHING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (4)TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM).
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT C3
SPECTRUM BUSINESS ESTATE
ANTHONYS WAY
MEDWAY CITY ESTATE
ROCHESTER
- Phone:
- 07758946425
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window