HYMERS COLLEGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising by parents for school activities. Primarily for the education and training of all children at the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 07 November 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean A Nugent | Chair | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jayne Jennings | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Rebecca Gray | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Radhika Khanna | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Kirk | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Copeland | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Anne Linter | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Doyle | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Pennack | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Louise Tame | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Anthony Schofield | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen-Jane Kaye | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Justin Stanley | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandhya Pisharody | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Doyle | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denis Thompson | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.74k | £8.08k | £6.39k | £27.51k | £24.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.59k | £5.84k | £19.98k | £15.74k | £19.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED 13 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF HYMERS COLLEGE, KINGSTON UPON HULL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL WHICH THE GOVERNORS ARE NOT ABLE TO PROVIDE AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT EXPAND AND DEVELOP THE SCHOOL FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hymers College
Hymers Avenue
Hull
HU3 1LW
- Phone:
- 01482 343555
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window