BE FREE CAMPAIGN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Be Free Campaign is a mental health charity that aims to give people the tools they need to look after their mental health and wellbeing in order to live happier more fulfilling lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,586 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shantanu Kundu | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Lottie Seymour | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Allman | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Finn Thompson | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr ARABINDA KUNDU | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/09/2021 | 20/09/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £26.88k | £95.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26k | £15.73k | £48.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.26k | £4.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 September 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 May 2020 as amended on 06 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF MENTAL HEALTH IN ENGLAND: A) PROVIDING PRACTICAL ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT; B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MENTAL HEALTH BY TRAINING COURSES AND EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Be Free Campaign
54 St James Street
L1 0AB
- Phone:
- 07415382229
- Email:
- info@befreecampaign.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window