SRI SIVASUBRAMANIYA SWAMI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Hindu Faith for the benefit of the public. This is achieved by: 1) Rented (or buying in future) a place for the temple for people to attend and worship 2) Encourage the attendees to enhance their knowledge on dharma as said in the Hindu doctrines and scriptures being earnestly advocated by the priest. 3) Encourage the attendees to offer prayer by attending the temple regularly; a
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 16 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Srimathi Sankaragurukkal | Chair | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mahadevan Meikum Perumal | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sampath Kumar Krishnasamy kuppusamy | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Danon Lutchmee Kaydoo | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bhuvaneswaran Velayudhem | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Srinivasan Krishnamoorthy | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rajesh Pannirselvam | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Panneerselvam Thangavel | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sankara Gurukkal Kalyanasundara Gurukkal | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gnanasekar Sundaramoorthy | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vijayakumar Masilamani | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kalyanaraman Gnanaprakasam | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Sethuraman Ganapathy | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Sundar Venkataraman | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Basdeo Kaydoo | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.52k | £16.39k | £29.97k | £20.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.17k | £6.30k | £9.22k | £12.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE HINDU FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED BY: 1) ENCOURAGING THE ATTENDEES TO HONOUR DIVERSITY, FREEDOM OF WORSHIP, LIBERTY, AND JUSTICE TO ALL; 2) ENCOURAGING THE ATTENDEES TO ENHANCE THEIR KNOWLEDGE ON DHARMA AS SAID IN THE HINDU DOCTRINES AND SCRIPTURES BEING EARNESTLY ADVOCATED BY THE PRIEST; 3) ENCOURAGING THE ATTENDEES TO OFFER PRAYER BY ATTENDING THE TEMPLE REGULARLY; AND TO LEARN YOGA AND MEDITATION; 4) ADVANCING THE HINDU FAITH BY ENCOURAGING CHILDREN TO LEARN THE KEY SCRIPTURES AND SLOGAS WHICH HELPS THEM TO LEAD A RIGHTEOUS LIFE; 5) TO RENT OR BUY A PLACE FOR "LONDON SRI SIVASUBRAMANIYA SWAMI THIRUKKOVIL", A HINDU TEMPLE AS A HOLY PLACE OF WORSHIP AND ENRICH THE DEVOTEES TO OFFER THEIR CUSTOMARY PRAYERS 6) TO RUN AND MAINTAIN THE DAY TO DAY OPERATIONS OF THE TEMPLE 7) TO PROMOTE CULTURAL ACTIVITIES, RELIGIOUS STUDIES AND ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 WHITEHALL ROAD
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 6AF
- Phone:
- 07960936473
- Email:
- SMT.croydon@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window