AP FOUNDATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education, training and rehabilitation of young adult offenders and those at risk of offending.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 April 2020: CIO registration
- AP FOUNDATION CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Manisha Knights | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Joan Wenham OBE | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN LYN | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Myers | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £3.85k | £24.96k | £31.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.45k | £7.71k | £18.46k | £40.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £24.96k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO, BEING UNDERTAKEN AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE, IS: TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND RECIDIVISM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING MENTORING SCHEMES TO YOUNG OFFENDERS IN CUSTODY; B) PROVIDING EMPLOYMENT SUPPORT OR ASSISTANCE TO FIND ACCOMMODATION FOR THOSE YOUNG ADULT OFFENDERS IN PRISON, THOSE ON PROBATION AND THOSE AT RISK OF RE OFFENDING; C) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. D) PROVIDING ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO YOUNG ADULTS AT RISK OF OFFENDING BY MEANS OF THE DEVELOPMENT AND IMPLEMENTATION OF COMMUNITY PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
277 Gray's Inn Road
London
WC1X 8QF
- Phone:
- 07908 064 449
- Email:
- andrew@apfoundation.co.uk
- Website:
-
apfoundation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window