AURAS DOGS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The rescue, rehabilitation and rehoming of abandoned and abused dogs through the UK Operating in the South West of England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 2021: CIO registration
- 16 January 2025: Funds received from 279454 THE STROUD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauren Hunt | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Fern | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Ford | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.86k | £66.13k | £189.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.90k | £61.41k | £190.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 September 2023 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 September 2023 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS BOTH IN THE UK AND ROMANIA BY PROVIDING SAFE SHELTER AND SECURITY FOR DOGS IN NEED OF CARE BY REASON OF MISTREATMENT, ABANDONMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USEAGE. TO ADVANCE ANIMAL WELFARE BY THE PROVISION OF VETERINARY TREATMENT, REHABILITATION AND TRAINING OF DOGS IN OUR CARE. TO SUPPORT THE CONTROL OF FERAL DOGS BY MEANS OF REGULAR FINANCIAL CONTRIBUTIONS TO NEUTERING CAMPAIGNS. TO ACTIVELY SEEK HOMES FOR RESCUED ANIMALS AND ADVANCE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF DOG WELFARE BY PROVIDING TRAINING SUPPORT TO ADOPTERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elm View Kennels
Bristol Road
Cambridge
GLOUCESTER
GL2 7AN
- Phone:
- 07792274423
- Email:
- Aurasdogs@gmail.com
- Website:
-
AurasDogs.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window