NAI’S HOUSE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nai's House is an amalgamation of youth and wellbeing services, offering a unique user-led model, and delivered by volunteers who have their own experiences of poor mental health and are powered by a passion to affect change in their community. We provide immediate, confidential, flexible and easy to access holistic mental health support in a non-clinical setting for children and young adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 November 2020: CIO registration
- NAI'S HOUSE COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melissa Morbeck Coke-Smyth | Chair | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elena Messineo | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Le Brocq | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Barrett | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Gray | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.43k | £94.45k | £91.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.98k | £58.66k | £93.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Nov 2020 as amended on 30 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES OF INDIVIDUALS AGED 5 - 30 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO OXFORDSHIRE, AND THROUGHOUT ENGLAND, WHO ARE FEELING SUICIDAL THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF CRISIS RESPONSE, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING WITH THE AIM OF PREVENTING SUICIDE. 2. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN OXFORDSHIRE, AND THROUGHOUT ENGLAND, AFFECTED BY OR BEREAVED BY SUICIDE THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC RESIDENT IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO OXFORDSHIRE, AND THROUGHOUT ENGLAND ABOUT EMOTIONAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND SUICIDE THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF MENTAL HEALTH AND SUICIDE PREVENTION TRAINING. 4. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE COMMUNITY AGED 5 TO 30 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO OXFORDSHIRE, AND THROUGHOUT ENGLAND SUFFERING FROM EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS OR ILLNESS BY PROVISION OF NON-CLINICAL SUPPORT, COUNSELLING, COMPLEMENTARY TREATMENTS AND A PROGRAMME OF PHYSICAL, CREATIVE AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WITH THE PURPOSE OF ALLEVIATING SYMPTOMS CAUSED BY MENTAL ILL HEALTH. 5. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND SUPPORT YOUNG PEOPLE WITH POOR EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL HEALTH, WHO ARE RESIDENT IN BUT NOT LIMITED TO OXFORDSHIRE, AND THROUGHOUT ENGLAND TO DEVELOP THE SKILLS, CAPABILITIES AND CAPACITIES THAT WILL ENABLE THEM TO OVERCOME PERSONAL BARRIERS PREVENTING THEM FROM ENGAGING MEANINGFULLY IN SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF SUPPORT, CREATIVE, PHYSICAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AND COUNSELLING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GARTH
LAUNTON ROAD
BICESTER
OXFORDSHIRE
OX26 6PS
- Phone:
- 07437497697
- Email:
- hello@naishouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window