THE CINEMA ORGAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity acquires, maintains and enhances theatre organs; holds concerts, silent film presentations, conventions, workshops, and talks; builds, maintains and makes available an archive of printed and recorded material; provides financial assistance towards registration and/or travel for people aged 25 or less to attend a convention or workshop.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 April 2020: CIO registration
- 09 January 2025: Funds received from 1136958 THE TROCADERO WURLITZER TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Carter | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David John Schuster | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Leslie Whitehouse | Trustee | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN NICHOLSON | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LEEMING | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Laflin | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Roderick Field | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM PHILLIPS | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|||||
SIMON GLEDHILL | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Ian Lowe | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STEPHENSON | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Pearsall | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WARNER | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.89k | £26.45k | £218.51k | £52.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.91k | £27.24k | £57.86k | £54.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS BY THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC, WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THEATRE/CINEMA ORGAN MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A)ACQUIRING, MAINTAINING AND ENHANCING THEATRE ORGANS; (B)BUILDING, MAINTAINING AND MAKING AVAILABLE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AN ARCHIVE OF PRINTED AND RECORDED MATERIAL ON THE HISTORY OF THE THEATRE ORGAN, ITS TECHNICAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION, AND ITS MUSIC; (C)HOLDING CONCERTS, SILENT FILM PRESENTATIONS, CONVENTIONS, WORKSHOPS, AND TALKS FOCUSING ON THE HISTORY, MUSICAL USE, AND PLAYING OF THE THEATRE ORGAN; AND (D)PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 25 OR LESS WISHING TO ATTEND A CONVENTION OR WORKSHOP WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO DO SO, BY CONTRIBUTING TO THE COST OF REGISTRATION AND/OR TRAVEL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 LARCH WAY
SLEAFORD
NG34 7UG
- Phone:
- 01529306737
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window