THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SYDENHAM AND FOREST HILL, HOLY TRINITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 17 August 2020: Standard registration
- HOLY TRINITY CHURCH, SYDENHAM & FOREST HILL (Working name)
- HOLY TRINITY PCC, SYDENHAM & FOREST HILL (Working name)
- HT BEING CHURCH IN SE LONDON (Working name)
- SYDENHAM & FOREST HILL, HOLY TRINITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Benjamin Strain | Chair | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debra Anne Lillistone-Squires | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Sudhir Nemalladinne | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Barrett | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tijen Mustafa Erkas | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarita Kim Fenton | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miles Alexander Winter | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Ann Knight | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Kronbergs | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ikiriba-Ekenta Dorcas Efayena | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.82k | £101.61k | £106.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.90k | £112.62k | £131.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH
TRINITY PATH
SYDENHAM PARK
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02086990172
- Email:
- office@holytrinity.life
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window