ST FRANCIS LEPROSY GUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Francis Leprosy Guild is a UK charity working towards a leprosy free world. We support over 40 leprosy centres and projects in 14 countries in Africa, Asia and Brazil. We fund Training, Research into leprosy prevention and diagnosis, Active case finding to find and treat leprosy early, Care and rehabilitation through leprosy centres and hospitals, Emergency relief and capital equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bangladesh
- Brazil
- Burma
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Liberia
- Madagascar
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Sri Lanka
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Nicholas Reed | Chair | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Pearce | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ann Connolly-Newland | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Donal O'Sullivan | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Dibb | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Barton | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Liam Allmark | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Noel Gill | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.54m | £537.58k | £979.83k | £391.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.56k | £616.02k | £746.88k | £881.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.53m | £518.83k | £957.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £751 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.40k | £18.00k | £22.31k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £164.82k | £199.14k | £793.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £164.41k | £314.52k | £486.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £87.59k | £155.18k | £260.21k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £26.52k | £41.56k | £110.79k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £137.89k | £272.96k | £375.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.93k | £9.54k | £9.23k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £53.56k | £146.32k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY (A) FUNDING ORGANISATIONS GIVING RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WITH LEPROSY OR DISABLED AS A RESULT OF LEPROSY, THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; (B) FUNDING ACTIVITY TOWARDS PREVENTION AND CONTROL OF THE DISEASE OF LEPROSY, INCLUDING RELEVANT INVESTIGATIONS AND RESEARCH OF THE CAUSES, TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF THIS DISEASE; AND (C) CARRYING OUT OR FUNDING THE PROFESSIONAL EDUCATION OF THOSE ENGAGED IN THE PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF LEPROSY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 High Street
Arundel
West Sussex
BN18 9AJ
- Phone:
- 07754 592240
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window