Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE COLWYN BAY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 515759
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 November 2019 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required