Accounts and annual returns THE PAPILLON PROJECT

Charity number: 1189383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 18 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 18 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 11 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window