THE BARR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Barr Foundation is the grant making charitable arm of Grange Developments Ltd. The Foundation has two focus areas: youth homelessness and education. Its mission is to help establish an accessible path towards education, employment or training to young disadvantaged people whose main barriers are homelessness, risk of homelessness and financial hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 October 2020: CIO registration
- BARR FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sonia Barr | Chair | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Cooper | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pete Blythe | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Forsyth | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Forbes | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.33k | £6.08k | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 January 2023 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2021
(These accounts |
05 January 2023 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, PRIMARILY BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO REGISTERED CHARITIES WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO FURTHER THE EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION OR TRAINING NEEDS OF YOUNG DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY THE HOMELESS, THOSE AT RISK OF BEING HOMELESS OR THOSE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GROVE HOUSE
PENSILE ROAD
NAILSWORTH
STROUD
GL6 0AL
- Phone:
- 07728720260
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window